UT SB0210 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Equal Pay Amendments
Title
Equal Pay Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |