UT SB0209 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retention of Outside Counsel, Expert Witnesses, and Litigation Support Services by the Attorney General's Office
Title
Retention of Outside Counsel, Expert Witnesses, and Litigation Support Services by the Attorney General's Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2012-02-21 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-16 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-13 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0209.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/sbillint/sb0209.pdf |