UT SB0205 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Election Process Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Process Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ filed in Senate Secretary
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ failed in Senate Secretary
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-23SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-23SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-22SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-20SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-18SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-17 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-17 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-17 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20A1201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A1501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A1503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A5101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A8103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A9701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2220Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback