UT SB0203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Termination of Parental Rights Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Termination of Parental Rights Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2018-03-16 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2018-03-16SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2018-03-16SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-03-08 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-03-08 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-03-07 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2018-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2018-03-07SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2018-03-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2018-03-07HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2018-03-07HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ circled in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2018-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-03-07SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-03-07HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Judiciary Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2018-03-05HouseHouse/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Judiciary Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Judiciary Committee
2018-03-01HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-02-28HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2018-02-28HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-26SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-22SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-22SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-20SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-20SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-20SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-02-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/static/SB0203.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/sbillint/SB0203.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/sbillint/SB0203S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/sbillamd/SB0203S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/sbillenr/SB0203.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/SB0203S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=7837
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=7841
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=885&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=935&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=8892
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=8893
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1100&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1441&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback