UT SB0202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charter School Funding Amendments
Title
Charter School Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ motion to reconsider failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider failed in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ failed in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDU |
2014-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTEDU |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |