UT SB0202 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmaceutical Competitive Pricing
Title
Pharmaceutical Competitive Pricing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV | |
2011-02-21 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-14 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |