UT SB0201 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and Use Tax Modifications
Title
Sales and Use Tax Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |