UT SB0201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protection Against Unfair Competition Through Misappropriated Technology Act
Title
Protection Against Unfair Competition Through Misappropriated Technology Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-03-01 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |