UT SB0200 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cause of Action Amendments
Title
Cause of Action Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-12 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |