UT SB0198 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments Related to Deferred Deposit Lending

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments Related to Deferred Deposit Lending

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2016-03-10SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2016-03-09SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2016-03-09SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2016-02-25SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2016-02-23SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2016-02-22SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2016-02-22SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2016-02-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2016-02-19 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2016-02-18 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-02-18 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-02-18 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback