UT SB0196 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Software for Special Needs Children
Title
Software for Special Needs Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-19 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-19 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-08 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2012-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-08 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-03-08 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ circled in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-07 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-07 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-23 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-23 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-22 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-02-22 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-02-22 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2012-02-22 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-13 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-13 | Senate/ lifted from standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |