UT SB0191 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Modifications
Title
Law Enforcement Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Law Judges
Administrative Procedures
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Campus Safety
Colleges and Universities
Department of Public Safety
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Higher Education
Judicial Review of State Agency Adjudicative Proceedings
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Administrative Procedures
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Campus Safety
Colleges and Universities
Department of Public Safety
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Higher Education
Judicial Review of State Agency Adjudicative Proceedings
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 13 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |