UT SB0190 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Utility Fee Limitations
Title
Utility Fee Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTBUS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2014-02-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS |
2014-02-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |