UT SB0189 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Oil and Gas Operations Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and Gas Operations Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2017-03-09SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-03-01HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-28HouseSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-28HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-27HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-02-27HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-02-27HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2017-02-27HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2017-02-27SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-02-27SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-02-27SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-02-24SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-02-24SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-24SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-10SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-10SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-10SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-09SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-08SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2017-02-07SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-07SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-02-07 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-02-07 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback