UT SB0189 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and Gas Conservation Account Amendments
Title
Oil and Gas Conservation Account Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-06 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-06 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-03 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-03 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-03 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2015-02-13 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-02-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |