UT SB0188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Support Guidelines Advisory Committee Amendments
Title
Child Support Guidelines Advisory Committee Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2017-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-27 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-27 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-27 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2017-02-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-27 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-27 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2017-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |