UT SB0183S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0183S02
Note: Replaces legislation SB0183
Note: Replaces legislation SB0183
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption Agency Modifications
Title
Adoption Agency Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSUB |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTJLC |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0183S02 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
SB0183 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
SB0183 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB