UT SB0181 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pari-mutuel Horse Racing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pari-mutuel Horse Racing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2019-03-05SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-26SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-26SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-25SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-18 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-18 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-18 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback