UT SB0177 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Scholarships for Special Needs Students
Title
Scholarships for Special Needs Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-04 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Corporate Tax
Education
Income Tax
Individual Income Tax
Public Education
Revenue and Taxation
School Finance
State Board of Education
Education
Income Tax
Individual Income Tax
Public Education
Revenue and Taxation
School Finance
State Board of Education