UT SB0170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0170S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education Loan Amendments
Title
Education Loan Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0170S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0170.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0170.pdf |