UT SB0170 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver License Qualification Amendments
Title
Driver License Qualification Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-07 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-06 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-06 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |