UT SB0161 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Real Property Transfer Fee Amendments
Title
Real Property Transfer Fee Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Madsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Comm - Held in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-19 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-17 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |