UT SB0158 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Funding Amendments
Title
Local Government Funding Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTREV | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTREV | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTREV | |
2011-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0158.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0158.pdf |