UT SB0157 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Property Tax Revisions
Title
Property Tax Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2011-02-11 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |