UT SB0154 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxed Interlocal Entity Amendments
Title
Taxed Interlocal Entity Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-06 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-06 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-28 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Electricity
Energy
Interlocal Cooperation
Interlocal Entities
Local Government Infrastructure and Utilities
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Utilities
Public Utilities & Technology
Renewable and Clean Energy
Revenue and Taxation
Energy
Interlocal Cooperation
Interlocal Entities
Local Government Infrastructure and Utilities
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Utilities
Public Utilities & Technology
Renewable and Clean Energy
Revenue and Taxation