UT SB0154 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Fit Premises Act Modifications
Title
Utah Fit Premises Act Modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Ben McAdams [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |