UT SB0153 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sex Offender Registration Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex Offender Registration Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
2011-02-09 Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTJLC
2011-02-07 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTJLC
2011-02-07 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC
2011-02-03 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-02-02 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-02-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback