UT SB0152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0152S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcohol and Drug Related Offense Amendments
Title
Alcohol and Drug Related Offense Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL |
2013-02-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0152S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0152.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0152.pdf |