UT SB0149 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Qualifications for the Executive Director of the Department of Health
Title
Qualifications for the Executive Director of the Department of Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | House/ circled in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-10 | House/ motion to reconsider passed in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-09 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-23 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-02-23 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-04 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |