UT SB0147 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Forgery Law Amendments
Title
Forgery Law Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-10 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-09 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-09 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND | |
2011-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |