UT SB0141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income Tax Amendments
Title
Income Tax Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dabakis [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |