UT SB0140 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Charter School Board Amendments
Title
State Charter School Board Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-09 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-09 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-03 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-15 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-14 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2011-02-11 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |