UT SB0139 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Consumer Data Protection
Title
Motor Vehicle Consumer Data Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Commerce and Trade
Consumer Protection
Data and Cyber Security
Franchises
Motor Vehicles
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Transportation
Commerce and Trade
Consumer Protection
Data and Cyber Security
Franchises
Motor Vehicles
Public Utilities and Technology
Technology
Transportation
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SB0139.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0139.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/SB0139.fn.pdf |