UT SB0138 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sex Change Amendments
Title
Sex Change Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-24 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment failed # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |