UT SB0138 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance Coverage for Emergency Care
Title
Health Insurance Coverage for Emergency Care
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] | Sen. Mike McKell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-07 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-07 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-29 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-29 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-29 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |