UT SB0135 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor Vehicle Insurance Amendment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-15SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-15SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-03-04 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-04 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-24 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2021-02-24SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2021-02-24SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-02-22HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-02-22HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee
2021-02-17HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-16HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-02-16HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-08SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-08SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-03SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-03SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-01SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-01-28SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-28SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-26 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-26 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31A22301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/SB0135.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0135.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillamd/SB0135.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillenr/SB0135.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0135.sca.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0135.sca.02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0135.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0135.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18999
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19001
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=448&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=493&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20038
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=705&house=H

Bill Comments 750

feedback