UT SB0134 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tobacco Regulation Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco Regulation Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-02-17SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-29SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-26 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2657103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2662305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2662402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5914804Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback