UT SB0130 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Coordination of Benefits Amendments
Title
Workers' Compensation Coordination of Benefits Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTWED | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Comm - Held in SSTWED | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |