UT SB0130 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surplus Property Amendments
Title
Surplus Property Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Stuart Reid [R] | Rep. Ryan Wilcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-28 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-28 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-23 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTGOC | |
2011-02-23 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2011-02-16 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-04 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-04 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-31 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-31 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Department of Administrative Services
Executive Branch
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Affairs in General
Executive Branch
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Affairs in General