UT SB0129 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of State Debt Collection - Administrative Garnishment Order
Title
Office of State Debt Collection - Administrative Garnishment Order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-26 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in SCURCAL |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ circled in SCURCAL |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC |
2013-02-12 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2013-02-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-02-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-02-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO |
2013-01-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SINTRO |
2013-01-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-23 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |