UT SB0125 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitality Employee Grant Program
Title
Hospitality Employee Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Opportunity
Grant Programs and Incentives
Legislative Operations
New Rulemaking Authority
Sunsets and Repealers
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Opportunity
Grant Programs and Incentives
Legislative Operations
New Rulemaking Authority
Sunsets and Repealers