UT SB0123 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motion Picture Incentive Fund Amendments
Title
Motion Picture Incentive Fund Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-05 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-05 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-02 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2010-03-01 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTREV | |
2010-02-26 | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV | |
2010-02-25 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |