UT SB0122 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Exemption for Cedar Band of Paiute Tribe
Title
Tax Exemption for Cedar Band of Paiute Tribe
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV | |
2011-01-29 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTREV | |
2011-01-27 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTREV | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |