UT SB0118 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Students with Disabilities Funding Amendments
Title
Students with Disabilities Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Education
K-12 Education
New Rulemaking Authority
School Finance
Special Education
State Board of Education
Education
K-12 Education
New Rulemaking Authority
School Finance
Special Education
State Board of Education