UT SB0117 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Violence Amendments
Title
Domestic Violence Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Rep. Ryan Wilcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-08 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Substituted Bill |
2023-02-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-31 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-30 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Background Checks
Courts
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Grant Programs and Incentives
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officer Standards and Training
Peace Officers
Protective Orders
Public Safety
Victims
Courts
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Grant Programs and Incentives
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officer Standards and Training
Peace Officers
Protective Orders
Public Safety
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 36 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |