UT SB0116 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water Law - Nonprofit Corporation Amendments
Title
Water Law - Nonprofit Corporation Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-01-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/static/SB0116.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillint/SB0116.pdf |