UT SB0116 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Armed Forces Property Tax Exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Armed Forces Property Tax Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-14 Senate/ substituted in SSUB
2012-02-14 Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
2012-02-14 Senate/ circled in S2ND
2012-02-14 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2012-02-10 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND
2012-02-09 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND
2012-02-02 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2012-02-02 Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTREV
2012-02-01 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV
2012-02-01 Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV
2012-01-24 Senate Comm - Held in SSTREV
2012-01-24 Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTREV
2012-01-23 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV
2012-01-23 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2012-01-20 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2012-01-18 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2012-01-18 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2012-01-18 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback