UT SB0116 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Homestead Exemption Modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Exemption Modification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-04 Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
2011-02-25 Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTJLC
2011-01-28 Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC
2011-01-27 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC
2011-01-26 Senate Comm - Held in SSTJLC
2011-01-24 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-01-24 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-01-24 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback