UT SB0114 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal Utilities Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Utilities Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2016-03-18 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2016-03-18SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2016-03-18SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2016-03-18SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-03-16 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-15 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-11 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-11SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2016-03-10SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2016-03-10SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2016-03-10HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2016-03-10HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2016-03-10SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2016-03-10SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2016-03-10SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-03-10SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-08HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2016-03-07HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-03-02HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-29HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-02-29 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2016-02-29 Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2016-02-29 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2016-02-29SenateSenate/ floor amendment failed # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2016-02-29SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2016-02-26SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2016-02-26SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-26SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-18SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-02-18SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-11SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-11SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-09SenateBill Substituted by Standing Committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-09SenateSenate Comm - Held in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-09SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-09SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-05SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2016-02-01SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2016-02-01 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2016-01-29 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-01-29 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/static/SB0114.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillint/SB0114.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillint/SB0114S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillamd/SB0114S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/sbillenr/SB0114.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=5416&sequence=7469
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=5564&sequence=12456
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=671&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=699&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=6149&sequence=25014
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=1266&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=1619&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback