UT SB0113 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-15SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-15SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2021-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-03-09 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-03-09 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-05 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ circled in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House
2021-03-04HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2021-03-04HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-04HouseHouse/ substituted from # 3 to # 5 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-04HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-04HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-04HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-04HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee
2021-03-01HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2021-03-01HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Transportation Committee
2021-03-01HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee
2021-03-01HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in House Transportation Committee
2021-02-28HouseSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Transportation Committee
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-22HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-02-22HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-26SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-25SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-21SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63I2253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
721304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
722121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
722124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
727301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
729501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
729502Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/SB0113.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S05.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillamd/SB0113S05.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillenr/SB0113.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0113s05.hfap.01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S01_ComparedWith_SB0113.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S02_ComparedWith_SB0113S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S03_ComparedWith_SB0113S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S03.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S04.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S04_ComparedWith_SB0113S03.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S05.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0113S05_ComparedWith_SB0113S04.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S04.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0113S05.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19631
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19651
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=717&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=809&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20559
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20560
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1136&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1164&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1580&house=S

Bill Comments 750

feedback